California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 28, 2012
Bill May 14, 2012
Bill March 21, 2012
Bill March 12, 2012