|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6298.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4702.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4674.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|