California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1559 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill June 15, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012
Bill February 15, 2012