LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1559
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1559
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1559
Compare Versions
AB1559 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB1559 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1559 Amended June 15, 2012
AB1559 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1559 Amended February 15, 2012
AB1559 Introduced January 30, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1559 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB1559 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1559 Amended June 15, 2012
AB1559 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1559 Amended February 15, 2012
AB1559 Introduced January 30, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare