|
09/22/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 441, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 6100.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4574.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 4664.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|