California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1569 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/22/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1569CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 441 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 22, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 22, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 3, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Allen (Principal coauthors: Senators Wolk and Yee) JANUARY 31, 2012 An act to amend Section 5349.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1569, Allen. Community mental health services: assisted outpatient treatment. Existing law, Laura's Law, until January 1, 2013, regulates designated assisted outpatient treatment services, which counties may choose to provide for their residents. In counties where assisted outpatient treatment services are available, a court may order a person to obtain assisted outpatient treatment if the court finds the requisite criteria is met, as specified. Existing law requires the State Department of Mental Health to submit a report and evaluation of all counties implementing any component of this law to the Governor and the Legislature by July 31, 2011, as specified. This bill would extend authorization for the act to January 1, 2017, and would require the State Department of Health Care Services to submit the report by July 1, 2015. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5349.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 5349.5. (a) This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2017, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted on or before January 1, 2017, deletes or extends that date. (b) The State Department of Health Care Services shall submit a report and evaluation of all counties implementing any component of this article to the Governor and to the Legislature by July 1, 2015. The evaluation shall include data described in subdivision (d) of Section 5348.