California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1569 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2012

Amended

Bill July 3, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012