|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6775.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 6780.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5083.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5015.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5038.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4922.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|