California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 30, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012