LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1599
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1599
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1599
Compare Versions
AB1599 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB1599 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1599 Amended August 30, 2012
AB1599 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1599 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1599 Amended April 30, 2012
AB1599 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1599 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1599 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB1599 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1599 Amended August 30, 2012
AB1599 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1599 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1599 Amended April 30, 2012
AB1599 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1599 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare