|
08/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4445.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5167.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5168.)
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5138.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4814.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torres.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Torres.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|