California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2012

Amended

Bill May 30, 2012
Bill May 14, 2012
Bill March 12, 2012