LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1600
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1600
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1600
Compare Versions
AB1600 Chaptered August 27, 2012
AB1600 Enrolled August 13, 2012
AB1600 Amended May 30, 2012
AB1600 Amended May 14, 2012
AB1600 Amended March 12, 2012
AB1600 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1600 Chaptered August 27, 2012
AB1600 Enrolled August 13, 2012
AB1600 Amended May 30, 2012
AB1600 Amended May 14, 2012
AB1600 Amended March 12, 2012
AB1600 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare