|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6239.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4638.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4784.).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|