California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1652 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill March 19, 2012