LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1652
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1652
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1652
Compare Versions
AB1652 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB1652 Enrolled August 29, 2012
AB1652 Amended August 16, 2012
AB1652 Amended June 25, 2012
AB1652 Amended March 19, 2012
AB1652 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1652 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB1652 Enrolled August 29, 2012
AB1652 Amended August 16, 2012
AB1652 Amended June 25, 2012
AB1652 Amended March 19, 2012
AB1652 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare