|
07/09/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 54, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3939.).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4814.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4708.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|