LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1654
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1654
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1654
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 13, 2012
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 19, 2012
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
July 9, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
May 7, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 9, 2012
Compare