LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1654
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1654
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1654
Compare Versions
AB1654 Chaptered July 9, 2012
AB1654 Enrolled June 19, 2012
AB1654 Amended May 7, 2012
AB1654 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1654 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1654 Chaptered July 9, 2012
AB1654 Enrolled June 19, 2012
AB1654 Amended May 7, 2012
AB1654 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1654 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare