|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 535, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 5. Page 6609.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.)
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4859.).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5043.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 26).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|