California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1656 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill July 3, 2012
Bill June 13, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012