LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1656
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1656
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1656
Compare Versions
AB1656 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB1656 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1656 Amended July 3, 2012
AB1656 Amended June 13, 2012
AB1656 Amended March 29, 2012
AB1656 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1656 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB1656 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1656 Amended July 3, 2012
AB1656 Amended June 13, 2012
AB1656 Amended March 29, 2012
AB1656 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare