|
09/21/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6303.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4692.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4709.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|