California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1663 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2012

Amended

Bill June 20, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012