California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1663 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/20/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1663AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 20, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dickinson FEBRUARY 14, 2012 An act to amend Section  8664 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section  8669  of   to,  the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1663, as amended, Dickinson. Pupil instruction: California State Summer School for Mathematics and Science. Existing law establishes the California State Summer School for Mathematics and Science to provide academic development to enable pupils with demonstrated academic excellence in mathematics and science to receive intensive educational enrichment in these subjects and an opportunity for pupils who wish to study mathematics or science or to pursue careers that require a high degree of skills in and knowledge of mathematics and science. Existing law requests the Regents of the University of California to operate the summer school. Existing law requests the regents to set a tuition fee for the summer school within a range that corresponds to actual program costs, up to but not exceeding $1,000 per session in the year 2000, and to increase this fee by an amount of up to 5% each year thereafter.  Existing law also requests the regents to develop and implement a statewide application procedure, as specified, and requires that the cost of the application process be at least partially offset by charging each applicant a fee not to exceed $20.  This bill would instead request the regents to set a tuition fee within a range that corresponds to actual program costs of up to but not exceeding $2,810 per session in the year 2012  , but would return this provision to existing law on January 1, 2018  . The bill would also  increase the application fee to an amount not exceeding $30, and would  make  technical,  nonsubstantive revisions in  this provision   these provisions  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 8664 of the   Education Code   is amended to read:  8664. The Regents of the University of California are  hereby  requested to perform all of the following duties: (a) Provide for the operation and governance of the California State Summer School for Mathematics and Science, including the appointment of an advisory committee to assist in planning and administering the summer school. (b) Develop and implement a statewide application procedure in cooperation with appropriate state and local agencies, including, but not limited to, school districts, the California State University, and the California Community Colleges. The cost of the application process shall be at least partially offset by charging each applicant a fee not to exceed  twenty dollars ($20)   thirty dollars ($30)  . Applicants who are unable to pay the fee shall petition the University of California for a waiver, which shall be granted or denied pursuant to the rules and regulations adopted pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 8669. (c) Develop the curriculum of the summer school. (d) Establish a nonprofit foundation to develop and receive private support for the summer school or establish a separate account for donations. SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 8669 of the Education Code is amended to read: 8669. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature that at least 50 percent, but not more than 75 percent, of the actual costs of the California State Summer School for Mathematics and Science for each fiscal year would be financed by state funds beginning in the 1999-2000 fiscal year. The balance of the operating costs would be financed with fees and private support. (b) Except as provided in subdivision (c), the Regents of the University of California are requested to set a tuition fee within a range that corresponds to actual program costs, up to but not exceeding two thousand eight hundred ten dollars ($2,810) per session in the year 2012, and may increase this fee by an amount up to 5 percent each year thereafter. It is the intent of the Legislature that the University of California award full or partial scholarships on the basis of need and that pupils who are unable to pay all or part of the fee may petition the University of California for a fee reduction or waiver to ensure that a qualified applicant is not denied admission solely because of his or her inability to pay part or all of the fee. Any public announcement regarding the summer school program should include notification that need-based scholarships are available and information regarding the procedure for applying for a scholarship award. (c) For pupils who are not California residents, it is the intent of the Legislature that the Regents of the University of California set a tuition fee that is not less than the total actual costs to the summer school of services per pupil. (d) The foundation authorized to be established pursuant to subdivision (d) of Section 8664 may raise funds from the private sector that may be used by the summer school for general program operating costs, scholarships, program augmentation, public relations, recruitment activity, or special projects. Private support may include, but not necessarily be limited to, direct grants to the summer school from private corporations or foundations, individual contributions, in-kind contributions, or fundraising benefits conducted by any entity.  (e) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date.   SEC. 3.   Section 8669 is added to the   Education Code   , to read:   8669. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature that at least 50 percent, but not more than 75 percent, of the actual costs of the California State Summer School for Mathematics and Science for each fiscal year would be financed by state funds beginning in the 1999-2000 fiscal year. The balance of the operating costs would be financed with fees and private support. (b) Except as provided in subdivision (c), the Regents of the University of California are requested to set a tuition fee within a range that corresponds to actual program costs, up to but not exceeding one thousand dollars ($1,000) per session in the year 2000, and may increase this fee by an amount up to 5 percent each year thereafter. It is the intent of the Legislature that the University of California award full or partial scholarships on the basis of need and that pupils who are unable to pay all or part of the fee may petition the University of California for a fee reduction or waiver to ensure that a qualified applicant is not denied admission solely because of his or her inability to pay part or all of the fee. Any public announcement regarding the summer school program should include notification that need-based scholarships are available and information regarding the procedure for applying for a scholarship award. (c) For pupils who are not California residents, it is the intent of the Legislature that the Regents of the University of California set a tuition fee that is not less than the total actual costs to the summer school of services per pupil. (d) The foundation authorized to be established pursuant to subdivision (d) of Section 8664 may raise funds from the private sector that may be used by the summer school for general program operating costs, scholarships, program augmentation, public relations, recruitment activity, or special projects. Private support may include, but not necessarily be limited to, direct grants to the summer school from private corporations or foundations, individual contributions, in-kind contributions, or fundraising benefits conducted by any entity. (e) This section shall become operative on January 1, 2018.