LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1663
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1663
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1663
Compare Versions
AB1663 Chaptered September 21, 2012
AB1663 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1663 Amended June 20, 2012
AB1663 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1663 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1663 Chaptered September 21, 2012
AB1663 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1663 Amended June 20, 2012
AB1663 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1663 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare