|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 6102.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4577.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 4781.)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|