LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1680
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1680
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1680
Compare Versions
AB1680 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB1680 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB1680 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1680 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1680 Amended March 19, 2012
AB1680 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1680 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB1680 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB1680 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1680 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1680 Amended March 19, 2012
AB1680 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare