California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1680 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012
Bill March 19, 2012