|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 780, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6678.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4933.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5045.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|