California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1699 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 14, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012