LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1699
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1699
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1699
Compare Versions
AB1699 Chaptered September 29, 2012
AB1699 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1699 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1699 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1699 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1699 Amended June 26, 2012
AB1699 Amended April 17, 2012
AB1699 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1699 Chaptered September 29, 2012
AB1699 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1699 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1699 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1699 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1699 Amended June 26, 2012
AB1699 Amended April 17, 2012
AB1699 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare