|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5142.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|