LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1744
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1744
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1744
Compare Versions
AB1744 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB1744 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 31, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 23, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 20, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 16, 2012
AB1744 Amended July 5, 2012
AB1744 Amended March 29, 2012
AB1744 Introduced February 17, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1744 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB1744 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 31, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 23, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 20, 2012
AB1744 Amended August 16, 2012
AB1744 Amended July 5, 2012
AB1744 Amended March 29, 2012
AB1744 Introduced February 17, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare