California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1744 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 31, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 23, 2012
Bill August 20, 2012
Bill August 16, 2012
Bill July 5, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012