|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4282.).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1702.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15).
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|