California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB178 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 17, 2012

Amended

Bill June 19, 2012
Bill May 31, 2012
Bill March 22, 2011