LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB178
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB178
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB178
Compare Versions
AB178 Chaptered July 17, 2012
AB178 Enrolled July 5, 2012
AB178 Amended June 19, 2012
AB178 Amended May 31, 2012
AB178 Amended March 22, 2011
AB178 Introduced January 24, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB178 Chaptered July 17, 2012
AB178 Enrolled July 5, 2012
AB178 Amended June 19, 2012
AB178 Amended May 31, 2012
AB178 Amended March 22, 2011
AB178 Introduced January 24, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare