|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 28). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5187.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 16).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|