California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1900 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 31, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 14, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill May 2, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012