LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1900
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1900
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1900
Compare Versions
AB1900 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB1900 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1900 Amended August 31, 2012
AB1900 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1900 Amended August 22, 2012
AB1900 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1900 Amended June 14, 2012
AB1900 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1900 Amended May 2, 2012
AB1900 Amended April 19, 2012
AB1900 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1900 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1900 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB1900 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1900 Amended August 31, 2012
AB1900 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1900 Amended August 22, 2012
AB1900 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1900 Amended June 14, 2012
AB1900 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1900 Amended May 2, 2012
AB1900 Amended April 19, 2012
AB1900 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1900 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare