|
07/27/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1786.).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1171.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Measure version as amended on April 5 corrected.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|