LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB193
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB193
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB193
Compare Versions
AB193 Chaptered July 27, 2011
AB193 Enrolled July 13, 2011
AB193 Amended April 26, 2011
AB193 Amended April 5, 2011
AB193 Introduced January 27, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB193 Chaptered July 27, 2011
AB193 Enrolled July 13, 2011
AB193 Amended April 26, 2011
AB193 Amended April 5, 2011
AB193 Introduced January 27, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare