California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 13, 2011

Chaptered

Bill July 27, 2011

Amended

Bill April 26, 2011
Bill April 5, 2011