California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill June 16, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill March 24, 2011
Bill March 8, 2011