LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB194
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB194
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB194
Compare Versions
AB194 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB194 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB194 Amended August 30, 2011
AB194 Amended June 16, 2011
AB194 Amended May 31, 2011
AB194 Amended March 24, 2011
AB194 Amended March 8, 2011
AB194 Introduced January 27, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB194 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB194 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB194 Amended August 30, 2011
AB194 Amended June 16, 2011
AB194 Amended May 31, 2011
AB194 Amended March 24, 2011
AB194 Amended March 8, 2011
AB194 Introduced January 27, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare