BILL NUMBER: AB 194CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 458 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 4, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 4, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 31, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 6, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 30, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 24, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 8, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Beall (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bonilla, Brownley, Furutani, Gordon, Jeffries, Lara, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Portantino, Skinner, and Swanson) (Coauthors: Senators Hancock and Vargas) JANUARY 27, 2011 An act to add and repeal Section 66025.9 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 194, Beall. Public postsecondary education: priority enrollment: foster youth. Existing law requires the California State University and each community college district, and requests the University of California, with respect to each campus in their respective jurisdictions that administers a priority enrollment system, to grant priority for registration for enrollment to any member or former member of the Armed Forces of the United States, as defined, for any academic term attended at one of these institutions within 2 years of leaving active duty. This bill, until January 1, 2017, would require the California State University and each community college district, and requests the University of California, with respect to each campus in their respective jurisdictions that administers a priority enrollment system, to grant priority for registration for enrollment to foster youth or former foster youth, as defined. By revising requirements relating to student eligibility for priority registration at community college districts, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66025.9 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66025.9. (a) The California State University and each community college district shall, and the University of California is requested to, with respect to each campus in their respective jurisdictions that administers a priority enrollment system, grant priority in that system for registration for enrollment to a foster youth or former foster youth. (b) For purposes of this section, "foster youth" means a person who is currently in foster care, and "former foster youth" means a person who is an emancipated foster youth and who is up to 24 years of age. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2017, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2017, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.