|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 319, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6457.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4754.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4595.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|