LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2035
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2035
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2035
Compare Versions
AB2035 Chaptered September 14, 2012
AB2035 Enrolled September 6, 2012
AB2035 Amended August 21, 2012
AB2035 Amended June 18, 2012
AB2035 Amended April 16, 2012
AB2035 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2035 Chaptered September 14, 2012
AB2035 Enrolled September 6, 2012
AB2035 Amended August 21, 2012
AB2035 Amended June 18, 2012
AB2035 Amended April 16, 2012
AB2035 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare