California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2035 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012